Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/21/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/21/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/21/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/21/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/21/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/21/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/09/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/10/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/10/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/10/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/10/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/17/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/24/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/24/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/24/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/24/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/24/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/24/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/08/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/08/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/08/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/08/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/08/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/11/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/11/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/11/2008