Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 05/14/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/10/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/23/2008