Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/13/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/13/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/13/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/13/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 05/13/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/15/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/15/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/15/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/15/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/15/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/21/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/03/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/17/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/17/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/20/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/20/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/20/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/20/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/20/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/20/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/25/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/25/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/25/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/25/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/26/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/26/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/09/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/09/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/09/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/14/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/14/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/23/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/23/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/23/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/23/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/31/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/31/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/31/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/31/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/31/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/31/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/15/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/26/2008