Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/08/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/08/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/08/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/13/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/13/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/13/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/14/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/21/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/03/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/03/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/03/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/04/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/09/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/09/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/09/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/09/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/09/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/10/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/11/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/11/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/12/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/17/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/16/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/29/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/09/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/23/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/25/2008