Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/19/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/19/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/19/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/19/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/19/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/22/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/23/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/23/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/29/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/29/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/29/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/06/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/06/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/14/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/14/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/14/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/15/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/28/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/01/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/19/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/22/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/22/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/22/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/28/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/29/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/29/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/17/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/26/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/26/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/14/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/05/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/26/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/26/2008