Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/01/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/21/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/03/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/09/2008