Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/23/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/23/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/23/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/06/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/06/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/06/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/06/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/08/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/08/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/08/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/21/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/21/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/21/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/05/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/05/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/10/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/25/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/25/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/16/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/16/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/29/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/29/2008