Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/10/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/29/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/07/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/07/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/03/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/09/2008