Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/09/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/15/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/15/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/15/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/22/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/22/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/05/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/05/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/07/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/12/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/12/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/13/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/13/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/13/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/15/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/15/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/21/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/21/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/21/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/04/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/04/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/10/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/18/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/18/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/24/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/29/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/31/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/11/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/11/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/11/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/16/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/16/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/16/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/17/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/17/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/18/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/23/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/24/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/26/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/27/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/02/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/19/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/19/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/19/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/19/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/20/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/09/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/09/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/09/2008