Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 04/01/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/14/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/14/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/17/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/17/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/17/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/17/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/22/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/24/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/24/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/29/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/29/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/29/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/29/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/01/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/08/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/15/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/04/2008
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/09/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/29/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/09/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/22/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/27/2008