Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/09/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/09/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/09/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/10/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/16/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/05/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/10/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/31/2008