Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/18/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/18/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/19/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/31/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/31/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/31/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/06/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/06/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/08/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/08/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/16/2007