Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/01/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/01/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/01/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/01/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/01/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/01/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/01/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/01/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/01/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/01/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/08/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/08/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/08/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/08/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/08/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/08/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/08/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/08/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/08/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/09/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/09/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/16/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/16/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/16/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/16/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/24/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/01/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/04/2008