Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/18/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/29/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/16/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/01/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/12/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/19/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/22/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/22/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/22/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/23/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/23/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/23/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/25/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/25/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/25/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/25/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/03/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/03/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/03/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/03/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/08/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/09/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/09/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/16/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/16/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/16/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/23/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/23/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/07/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/25/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/27/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/27/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/11/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/30/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/30/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/30/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/31/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/22/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/12/2008