Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/04/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/04/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/05/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/11/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/15/2008