Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 01/18/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/24/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/24/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/24/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/24/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/24/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/24/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 01/24/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/24/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 01/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/24/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/24/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/30/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 01/30/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/30/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/30/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 01/30/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/30/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/30/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/30/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/31/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/06/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/08/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/13/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/16/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/28/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/28/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/01/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/06/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/06/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/06/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/12/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/12/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/12/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/12/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/12/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 03/12/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/12/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/13/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/22/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/22/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/22/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/22/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/22/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/27/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/28/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/08/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/10/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/10/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/10/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/15/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/06/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/15/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/11/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/19/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/27/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/10/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/18/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/03/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/10/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 11/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/01/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/05/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/07/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/08/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/14/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/14/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/14/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/14/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/15/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/04/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/05/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/18/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 01/16/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/28/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/28/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/26/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/09/2008