Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/14/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/14/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/25/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/25/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/25/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/25/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/06/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/06/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/14/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/14/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/14/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/14/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/14/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/14/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/14/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/14/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/14/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/14/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/01/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/01/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/01/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/01/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/03/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/03/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/15/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/29/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/05/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/14/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/14/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/22/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/10/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/29/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/08/2008