Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/17/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/22/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/22/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/22/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/22/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/22/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/22/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/22/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/22/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 01/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 01/22/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 01/22/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/22/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/22/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/22/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/22/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/22/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/22/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/22/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 01/22/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/22/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/22/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/22/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/22/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/22/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 01/22/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/22/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/22/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/22/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/22/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/22/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/22/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/22/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 01/22/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/22/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/22/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/22/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/22/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/22/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/22/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/23/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/23/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 01/23/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/23/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/23/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/23/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/23/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 01/23/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/23/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/23/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/23/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/23/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/23/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/29/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 01/29/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/29/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/29/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/30/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 01/30/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/30/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/30/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/30/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 01/30/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/30/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 01/30/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 01/30/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 01/30/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/30/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/31/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/31/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/31/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 01/31/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/31/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/05/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/05/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/05/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/07/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/07/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/07/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/07/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/07/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/07/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/07/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/07/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/07/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 02/07/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/07/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/07/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/07/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/07/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/07/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/07/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/07/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/09/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/09/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/09/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/09/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/27/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/27/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/27/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/27/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/08/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/08/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/08/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/08/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/08/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/09/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/09/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/09/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/09/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/13/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/13/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/13/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/13/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/13/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/13/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/14/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/14/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/14/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/14/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/21/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/21/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/21/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/21/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/21/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/22/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/22/2007