Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/30/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/30/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/30/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/30/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/30/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/30/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/30/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/30/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/30/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/31/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/31/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/08/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/08/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/08/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/08/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/08/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/28/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/28/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/09/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/27/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/01/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/15/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/14/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/14/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 08/03/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/03/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/03/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/13/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/05/2008