Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/19/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/12/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/05/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/06/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/14/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/29/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/22/2008