Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/19/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/19/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/19/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/19/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/19/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/19/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/19/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/19/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/19/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/19/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/19/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/19/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/19/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/19/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/19/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/19/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/23/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/23/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/23/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/23/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 01/23/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/23/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/23/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/23/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/23/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/23/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/23/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/23/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/23/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/23/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/05/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/05/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/05/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/05/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/08/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/08/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/12/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/12/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/15/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/15/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/15/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/15/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/15/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/15/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/15/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/15/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/27/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/27/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/27/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/27/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/07/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 03/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/07/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/07/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/07/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/07/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/07/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/07/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/13/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/13/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/14/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/26/2007