Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 12/13/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/17/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/28/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/12/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/09/2008