Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/13/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/21/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/17/2008