Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 11/13/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 11/13/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/04/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 12/04/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/04/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 01/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/07/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/05/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/16/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/16/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/16/2008