Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 11/06/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 11/06/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/06/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 11/06/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/06/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/09/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/09/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/09/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/09/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/09/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/13/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/13/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/14/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/14/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/15/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/15/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/04/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/04/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/04/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/04/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/04/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/06/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/06/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 12/11/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/11/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/12/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/12/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/17/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 12/17/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/19/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/17/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/22/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/29/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 02/25/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/26/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/28/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/11/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/11/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/11/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/13/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/14/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/02/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/02/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/08/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/07/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/03/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/18/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/24/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 09/08/2008