Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 11/01/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/13/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/05/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/18/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/19/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/28/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/28/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/07/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/07/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/07/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/07/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/07/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 02/13/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/13/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/26/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/27/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/27/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/04/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/04/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/06/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/13/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/13/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/15/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/23/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/29/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/30/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/07/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/13/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/04/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/17/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/26/2008