Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 10/31/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 10/31/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/12/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/19/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/04/2008