Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 10/31/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/14/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/14/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/15/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/06/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/06/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/18/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/18/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/18/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/18/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/18/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/18/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/18/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/18/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/18/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/18/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/18/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/18/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/18/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/18/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/18/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/18/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/18/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/18/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/18/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/18/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 12/18/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/18/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/18/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/18/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/18/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/18/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/18/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/18/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/19/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/19/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/19/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/19/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/19/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/16/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/10/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/16/2008