Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 10/22/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 10/22/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/22/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 10/22/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 10/22/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 10/22/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/30/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/05/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/05/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/10/2008