Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/09/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/10/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/10/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/10/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/31/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/07/2007