Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 10/04/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/18/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/18/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/18/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/18/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 10/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 10/18/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/18/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/05/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/05/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 12/05/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/18/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/16/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/19/2008