Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 10/03/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/17/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/24/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/25/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/01/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/07/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/08/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/11/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/16/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/16/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/17/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/22/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/22/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/23/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/24/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/29/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/29/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/29/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/01/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/08/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/10/2008