Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/10/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/12/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/12/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/24/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/07/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/27/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/27/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/25/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/05/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/28/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/06/2008