Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/05/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/05/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/05/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/29/2008