Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/14/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 11/14/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/14/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/15/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/04/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/04/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/12/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 12/12/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/18/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/18/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/19/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/19/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/15/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/22/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/23/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/26/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/28/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/03/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/03/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/05/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/10/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/31/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/25/2008