Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/12/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/12/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/12/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/12/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/17/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 01/17/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/17/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/17/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/17/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/19/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/19/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/19/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/19/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/22/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/23/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/23/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/23/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/23/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/23/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/23/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/23/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/23/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/31/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/31/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 01/31/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/31/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/31/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 01/31/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/31/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/08/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/13/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/13/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/13/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/15/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/27/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/05/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/26/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/26/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/28/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/28/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/01/2007