Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 09/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/17/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/03/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/03/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/16/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/16/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/24/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/09/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/09/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/09/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/16/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/16/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/05/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/05/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/19/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/23/2008