Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/19/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/24/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/24/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/03/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/03/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/16/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/25/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/25/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/25/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/25/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/25/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/25/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/25/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/25/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/25/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/25/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/25/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/31/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/31/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/31/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/31/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/06/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/06/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/06/2007