Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/06/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/06/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/14/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/14/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/14/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/14/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/18/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/18/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/25/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/25/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/09/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/09/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/10/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/22/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/29/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 12/04/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/23/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/06/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/06/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 04/22/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/22/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/23/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/23/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/23/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/05/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/12/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/12/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/12/2008