Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/19/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/19/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/09/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/09/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/15/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/19/2007