Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/10/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/31/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/08/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/03/2008