Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/03/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/04/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/04/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/10/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/24/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/02/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/02/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/15/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/16/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/17/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/23/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/05/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/07/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/12/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/18/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 12/19/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/04/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/09/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/16/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/22/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/24/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/30/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/30/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/30/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/30/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/30/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/08/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/10/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/18/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/18/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/23/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/25/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/25/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/10/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/16/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/16/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/17/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/23/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/24/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/29/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/29/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/31/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/09/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/10/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/19/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/19/2008