Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/05/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/17/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/01/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/11/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/11/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/26/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/02/2008