Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 07/31/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/31/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 08/01/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/04/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/13/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/13/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/13/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/14/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/21/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/26/2008