Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/11/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/11/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/11/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 01/11/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 01/11/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/11/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/11/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/11/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/11/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 01/11/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/11/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 01/11/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/11/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 01/11/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/11/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 01/11/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/16/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/18/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/07/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/12/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/19/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/19/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/19/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/19/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/19/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/19/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/23/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/23/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/23/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/23/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/23/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/23/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/23/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/23/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/23/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/23/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/23/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/23/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/23/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/23/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/23/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/23/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/24/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/24/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/25/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/25/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/25/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/25/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/25/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 04/25/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/25/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/25/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/30/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/30/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/30/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/30/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/30/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/30/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/30/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/30/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/30/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/30/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/30/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/30/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/30/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/06/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/13/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/18/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/23/2008