Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 07/27/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/27/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/31/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 08/01/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 08/01/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/01/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/02/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 08/02/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/24/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/18/2007
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/12/2008