Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/24/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 07/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/27/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/27/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/30/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/30/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/30/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/01/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/01/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/01/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/01/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/03/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/03/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/03/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/03/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/23/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/06/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/06/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/15/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 01/15/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/13/2008