Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/24/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/24/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/26/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/26/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/30/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/31/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/31/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/31/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/31/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/02/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/02/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/04/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 08/04/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 08/04/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/04/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/04/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/04/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/05/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/05/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/05/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/14/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/14/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/14/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/14/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/14/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/17/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/17/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/17/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/17/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/20/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/20/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/20/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/20/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/20/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/24/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/24/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/25/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/25/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/27/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/02/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/04/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/04/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/09/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/09/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/16/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 10/16/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/16/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/16/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/25/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/25/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/31/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/31/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/31/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/31/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/01/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 11/07/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/07/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/07/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/19/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/19/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/19/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/19/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/16/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/16/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/16/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/07/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/26/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/09/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/09/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/17/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/17/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/21/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/21/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/05/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/12/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/03/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/03/2008