Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/19/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/30/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/30/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 08/02/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 08/02/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/07/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 10/15/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/15/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/29/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/10/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/10/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/17/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/18/2007
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/28/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/07/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 02/26/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 02/26/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/26/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/26/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/14/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/17/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/22/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/24/2008