Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/30/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/30/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/13/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/14/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/31/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/01/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/01/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/02/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/17/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/17/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/22/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/22/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/22/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/23/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/01/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/01/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/01/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/01/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/01/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/05/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/05/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/06/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/08/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/08/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/14/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/21/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/22/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/09/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/09/2008
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/09/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/10/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/10/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/10/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/10/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/10/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/12/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/12/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/12/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/18/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/18/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/18/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/18/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/18/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/18/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/08/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/15/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/15/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/16/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/23/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/31/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/08/2008